NH HB1640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-102 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-102 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to parental notification prior to abortion.
Title
Relative to parental notification prior to abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 191 N: 102 NV: 58 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-102 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 146 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 64 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-16 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 11:00 am Reps Hall |
2019-12-12 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 29 |