NH HB1623 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/21/2020; Chapter 27; I. Sec 1-3 Eff as prov. in Sec. 36 II. Rem. Eff: 7/21/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to telemedicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to telemedicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 351 Abs: 38) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-22HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/21/2020; Chapter 27; I. Sec 1-3 Eff as prov. in Sec. 36 II. Rem. Eff: 7/21/2020
2020-07-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-16HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-117 06/30/2020
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2020-1345s and 2020-1530s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment #2020-1530s, with the Amending Language Reading as Intended: "Amend RSA 415-J:3, IV-VI, as inserted by section 3 of the bill by replacing it with the following:", Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Bradley Moved to take up Floor Amendment #2020-1530s with the Amending Language Reading as Intended: "Amend RSA 415-J:3, IV-VI, as inserted by section 3 of the bill by replacing it with the following:", 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Reconsider the vote on: Floor Amendment #2020-1530s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2020-1530s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1345s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-05SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1345s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-01SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate5. Webinar ID: 911 7516 8535 Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13017158592,,91175168535# or 13126266799,,91175168535# Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799, or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_My1hryTkS52unCldLbpOwA Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01SenateRemote Hearing: 06/04/2020, 08:05 am, on proposed amendment # 2020-1286s; Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01SenateRemote Hearing: 06/04/2020, 08:00 am; Senate Calendar 21A
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0509h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 35
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0509h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 35
2020-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0509h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 21
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2020-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2020-01-22HousePublic Hearing: 01/28/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-12-06HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback