NH HB1615 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 78; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 78; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the autism registry.
Title
Relative to the autism registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2024; Chapter 78; eff. 8/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-10 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/30/2024 House Journal 15 P. 36 |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/30/2024); Senate Journal 17 |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2024; Senate Journal 11 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | ==ROOM CHANGE== Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 13A |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0881h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-0881h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0881h 03/06/2024 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/21/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 27 |