NH HB161 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to customer generators of electricity as group hosts under net metering.
Title
Relative to customer generators of electricity as group hosts under net metering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 80 |
2023-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed DV 172-187 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 80 |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/21/2023 (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 19 |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |