NH HB1598 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizing the possession and use of cannabis.
Title
Legalizing the possession and use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Daryl Abbas [R] | Rep. Fred Doucette [R] | Rep. Manny Espitia [D] | Rep. Jennifer Rhodes [R] |
Rep. Jason Osborne [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Rene Nunez [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - OTPA (Y: 169 N: 156 NV: 32 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 118 N: 216 NV: 23 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 118 N: 216 NV: 23 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1172h-1198h-1230h-1283h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-156 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-04-01 | House | Lay HB1598 on Table (Rep. Homola): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 118-216 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1286h (Reps. Adjutant, Abramson): Amendment Failed DV 77-257 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1283h (Rep. Conley): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1230h (Rep. Marsh): Amendment Adopted DV 212-89 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1198h (Reps. Umberger, Major): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1172h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2022-03-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1172h (Vote 12-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-18 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/21/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-03-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-22 | House | Lay HB 1598-FN on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Failed DV 114-238 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | FLAM # 2022-0417h (Rep. Testerman): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2022-0207h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted DV 235-119 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 09:30 am State House Reps Hall |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0207h (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 09:30 am State House Reps Hall |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |