NH HB1597 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the maximum weekly unemployment benefit amount.
Title
Relative to the maximum weekly unemployment benefit amount.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Sullivan [D] | Rep. David Rochefort [R] | Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Jonah Wheeler [D] |
Rep. Lisa Post [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/14/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-24 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 |