NH HB159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the committee to study the laws relating to condominium and homeowners' associations.
Title
Repealing the committee to study the laws relating to condominium and homeowners' associations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG. 497 |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 18 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar13, PG. 237 |
2015-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/12/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 210 |