NH HB1581 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-22 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to cultivation locations for alternative treatment centers.
Title
Relative to cultivation locations for alternative treatment centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-22 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2024 |
2024-06-27 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Sen. Abbas Moved Laid on Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/22/2024; Senate Journal 14 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/22/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 20 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to next week, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Remove HB 1581 from the Consent Calendar; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2024 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 14 |
2024-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/14/2024 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 10 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 25 |