NH HB157 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the joint committee on legislative facilities and sexual harassment policies.
Title
Relative to the joint committee on legislative facilities and sexual harassment policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
HB157 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee