NH HB157 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB157
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Hearing: Oct 10 @ 1:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-18 - Executive Session: 10/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
Hearing: Oct 10 @ 1:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 203
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the joint committee on legislative facilities and sexual harassment policies.
Title
Relative to the joint committee on legislative facilities and sexual harassment policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-18 | House | Executive Session: 10/10/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 61 |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB157 11/01/2023 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 18 |
2023-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 House Calendar 43 |
2023-10-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/11/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 House Calendar 43 |
2023-03-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2023 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Legislative Administration |
Same As/Similar To
HB157 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Retained in Committee