NH HB1552 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring learner's permits for certain persons seeking drivers' licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring learner's permits for certain persons seeking drivers' licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 167 N: 114 NV: 70 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateIntroduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-13HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0875h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 167-114 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 202
2020-03-13HouseAmendment # 2020-0875h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 202
2020-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0875h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 76
2020-02-26House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 (if necessary)
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2020-02-18HousePublic Hearing: 02/25/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback