NH HB1546 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0276; Effective Date 9/26/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0276; Effective Date 9/26/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to insurance coverage for tractors.
Title
Relative to insurance coverage for tractors.
Sponsors
Rep. Guy Comtois [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Richard Gordon [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] |
Rep. Stephen Palmer [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/28/2014; Chapter 0276; Effective Date 9/26/2014. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-05-07 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1514s (Rep. Butler) Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1514s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 11 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1514s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-1514s, 5/1/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Introduced 3/13/14 and Referred to Transportation |
2014-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0833h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-19 | House | Adopt Amendment #2014-0833h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0833h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 19 |
2014-02-25 | House | ===CONTINUED=== Executive Session: 3/04/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 2/20/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ===RECESSED=== |
2014-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2014 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-02-12 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/13/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |