NH HB1538 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/93480617681 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/93480617681 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a commission to develop and implement environmental education, outreach, and training programs and initiatives for qualified health care professionals relative to environmental toxins and health.
Title
Creating a commission to develop and implement environmental education, outreach, and training programs and initiatives for qualified health care professionals relative to environmental toxins and health.
Sponsors
Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Salloway [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] |
Rep. Francesca Diggs [D] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Gary Woods [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/03/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/93480617681 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 34 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 20 |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 26 |