NH HB1531 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 261; Eff. 6/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 261; Eff. 6/15/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting the legislature to open the state house on weekends.
Title
Permitting the legislature to open the state house on weekends.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 261; Eff. 6/15/2016 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 61 |
2016-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2117e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58 |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2117e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1391s and 1482s (Reps. Hinch, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 20 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1391s and 1482s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment #2016-1482s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1391s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Remove HB 1531 from the Consent Calendar; 04/21/2016 Senate Journal 14 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1391s, 04/21/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Introduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 16 |
2016-03-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2016 (Vote 22-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 8 |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-17 | House | Division I Work Session: 03/07/2016 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Finance 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2016-02-10 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 7 |
2016-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/10/2016 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2016 02:15 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 4 P. 17 |