NH HB153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB153
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 194-151 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 194-151 01/06/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Establishing a committee to study universal Internet access for New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study universal Internet access for New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. Larry Laflamme [D] |
Rep. Troy Merner [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted DV 194-151 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-17 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB153 11/17/2021 (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 39 |
2021-10-26 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-09-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-06-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846 |
2021-03-10 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96232478698 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92752912485 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 37 |
Same As/Similar To
HB153 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=113&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB153 |