NH HB153 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-26 - Executive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
Pending: House Science, Technology and Energy Committee
Hearing: Oct 26 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study universal Internet access for New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study universal Internet access for New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26HouseExecutive Session: 10/26/2021 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building302-304
2021-09-10HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2021-06-09House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 06/21/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98681120846
2021-03-10HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96232478698
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92752912485 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback