NH HB1524 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-149 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-149 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a national service alumni attraction and retention fund.
Title
Establishing a national service alumni attraction and retention fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Mary Heath [D] | Rep. David Luneau [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 194-149 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 0-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-02 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/24/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-02-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/10/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-26 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/02/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/26/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-09 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Ways and Means |