NH HB1520 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to procedures for guardians ad litem.
Title
Relative to procedures for guardians ad litem.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/14/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3 |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-09 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |