NH HB1512 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reducing school food waste and addressing child hunger.
Title
Relative to reducing school food waste and addressing child hunger.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Loughman [D] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-19 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow |
2020-03-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 11 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 25 |