NH HB1506 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to required votes to approve issuance of bonds.
Title
Relative to required votes to approve issuance of bonds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17 |
2024-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/11/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-15 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2024 01:20 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 22 |