NH HB1487 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the health effects of 5G technology.
Title
Relative to the health effects of 5G technology.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/06/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 9 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 22 |