NH HB1482 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 175; Eff. 6/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 175; Eff. 6/13/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Interstate Voter Registration Crosscheck Program.
Title
Relative to the Interstate Voter Registration Crosscheck Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 208 N: 140 NV: 23 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/03/2016; Chapter 175; Eff. 6/13/2016 |
2016-05-23 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 24 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Laid on Table, Division Vote 9Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved Ought to Pass; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Division Vote. 8Y-11N, Motion Failed; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Birdsell Moved to Remove HB 1482 from the Consent Calendar; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/12/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2016, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0676h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 208-140 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 80 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0676h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 80 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 48 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0676h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 48 |
2016-02-18 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/01/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-26 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment #2016-0639h: 03/01/2016 09:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/10/2016 08:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2016-02-25 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/12/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building308 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Election Law House Journal 4 P. 16 |