NH HB1480 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - House Signed By Governor 06/15/2012; Effective 08/14/2012; Chapter 0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-18 - House Signed By Governor 06/15/2012; Effective 08/14/2012; Chapter 0225
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring all local enforcement agencies and other officials responsible for enforcement of fire codes to provide information on the local and state appeals process when issuing a building permit or notice of violation.
Title
Requiring all local enforcement agencies and other officials responsible for enforcement of fire codes to provide information on the local and state appeals process when issuing a building permit or notice of violation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | House Signed By Governor 06/15/2012; Effective 08/14/2012; Chapter 0225 | |
2012-06-06 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.2609 | |
2012-06-06 | Senate Enrolled | |
2012-05-30 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1947s(NT) (Rep Renzullo): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 47, PG.2503 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1947s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.506 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Committee Amendment 1947s, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Amendment Adopted; Senate Journal 13, Pg.483 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Without Objection Rule 3-7 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment 1947s, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 13, Pg.483 | |
2012-05-09 | Senate Chair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment; Senate Journal 13, Pg.482 | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1947s, New Title, 5/9/12; Senate Calendar 18 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Hearing: 4/03/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 13 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7, Pg.187 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0940h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1319-1320 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0940h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1319-1320 | |
2012-02-22 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0940h; House Calendar 17, PG.1003-1004 | |
2012-02-22 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0940h for Mar 7 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1075 | |
2012-02-08 | House Continued Executive Session: 2/21/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2012-01-12 | House Executive Session: 1/31/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 ==RECESSED== | |
2012-01-12 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/25/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-12-22 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 1/12/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-11-28 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 7, PG. 357 |