NH HB1475 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to preventing strategic lawsuits against public participation.
Title
Relative to preventing strategic lawsuits against public participation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 17 |
2024-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/15/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11 |
2024-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-12-11 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 21 |