NH HB1475 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-160 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-160 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a death benefit for a school employee killed in the line of duty.
Title
Establishing a death benefit for a school employee killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 160 NV: 17 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-160 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 101 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0281h [^] House Calendar 14 P. 53 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 14-11; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 53 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210 |
2016-01-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 02/02/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2016-01-28 | House | ==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 01/28/2016 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2016-01-07 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2016 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Finance House Journal 4 P. 15 |