NH HB1461 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 286; I. Sec. 7 eff. 6/21/2016 ; II. Rem. eff. 8/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 286; I. Sec. 7 eff. 6/21/2016 ; II. Rem. eff. 8/20/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of and criteria for protection instream flow.
Title
Relative to the definition of and criteria for protection instream flow.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/21/2016; Chapter 286; I. Sec. 7 eff. 6/21/2016 ; II. Rem. eff. 8/20/2016 |
2016-06-15 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 66 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-06-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2124e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 59 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2124e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1829s (Rep. C. Christensen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 22 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1829s, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1829s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1829s, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2016, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0456h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 61 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0456h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 61 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0456h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 39 |
2016-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/11/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-02-02 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 4 P. 15 |