NH HB144 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0068
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency and clean energy districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 07/15/2011; Chapter 0068 | |
2011-05-04 | House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 13, Pg.270 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13, Pg.264 | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/20/11; Senate Calendar 20 | |
2011-04-06 | Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11, Pg.190 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0528h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.729-731 | |
2011-03-15 | House Amendment #0528h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.729-731 | |
2011-03-01 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0528h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.586-587 | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0528h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.536 | |
2011-01-19 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/25/2011 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 11, PG. 174 |