NH HB1435 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the powers of the state board of education.
Title
Relative to the powers of the state board of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 192 N: 132 NV: 20 Abs: 52) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0835h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-132 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 38 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0835h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 38 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0835h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 48 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 22 |