NH HB1435 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring law enforcement officials to disclose specific information relating to a police checkpoint.
Title
Requiring law enforcement officials to disclose specific information relating to a police checkpoint.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 4/1/14, Room 100, State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0196h Motion Adopted Div 242-49 |
2014-03-05 | House | Adopt Amendment #0196h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0196h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |