NH HB1431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Reconsider 2022-2085c (Rep. Espitia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-177 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-26 - Reconsider 2022-2085c (Rep. Espitia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-177 05/26/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the parental bill of rights.
Title
Establishing the parental bill of rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Conference Committee Report (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 177 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-26 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 171 N: 176 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-26 - House - Table (Y: 169 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Accede (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 181 N: 157 NV: 18 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Reconsider (Y: 170 N: 177 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-26 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 171 N: 176 NV: 14 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-26 - House - Table (Y: 169 N: 173 NV: 19 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Accede (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 181 N: 157 NV: 18 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | House | Reconsider 2022-2085c (Rep. Espitia): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 170-177 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2085c: Failed, Regular Calendar 171-176 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Lay HB1431 on Table (Rep. Wolf): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 169-173 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2085c; Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Adopted; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2085c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Steven Smith Replaces Rep. DeSimone 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator French Replaces Senator Whitley; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conferee Change:Rep Osborne becomes Chair 05/19/22 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Osborne Replaces Rep. Smith 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. Packard Replaces Rep. Rice 05/19/2022 |
2022-05-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/19/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-05-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Gannon, Whitley; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1943s 2022-1881s 2022-1670s and Requests CofC (Reps. Rice, DeSimone, J. Nelson, D. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1943s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2022-1943s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1670s, and 2022-1881s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2022-1862s, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Amendment Failed; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2022-1881s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1670s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1670s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0881h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 181-157 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2022-0881h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0881h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 0900am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/09/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 10:30 am State House Reps Hall |
2022-01-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law |