NH HB1415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study campaign finance disclosure laws and anonymous contributions, receipts, and expenditures.
Title
Establishing a committee to study campaign finance disclosure laws and anonymous contributions, receipts, and expenditures.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Wells [D] | Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
Rep. George Saunderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0730h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0730h (NT): Amendment Adopted DV 229-89 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 68 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0730h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 52 |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2020 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 21 |