NH HB1409 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to review by the advisory council on child care of child care center licensing violations.
Title
Relative to review by the advisory council on child care of child care center licensing violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Ross Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 17 |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 03/06/2024 (Vote 9-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-02-15 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/21/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare House Journal 1 P. 19 |