NH HB1406 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to gender-based pricing of goods and services.
Title
Relative to gender-based pricing of goods and services.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 3 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 02/07/2024 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2024-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 19 |