NH HB140 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1425s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to private rights of action regarding pupil safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to private rights of action regarding pupil safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 207 N: 169 NV: 22 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1425s, 05/20/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24
2021-04-14SenateRemote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-169 04/08/2021
2021-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 38
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832
2021-02-23HousePublic Hearing: 02/23/2021 09:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94382337363 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 36

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback