NH HB1395 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the setting of cash bail.
Title
Relative to the setting of cash bail.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Stone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building204 |
2018-02-22 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 6 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 02/22/2018 (Vote 18-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 6 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 11:20 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 9 |