NH HB137 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 116; Eff: I. Sec 3 eff 6/30/23 II. Rem eff 8/29/23 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Passed on July 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 116; Eff: I. Sec 3 eff 6/30/23 II. Rem eff 8/29/23 House Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to boating safety equipment rules and vessel numbering rules, and establishing a committee to study boat registrations fees.
Title
Relative to boating safety equipment rules and vessel numbering rules, and establishing a committee to study boat registrations fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/30/2023; Chapter 116; Eff: I. Sec 3 eff 6/30/23 II. Rem eff 8/29/23 House Journal 17 |
2023-06-21 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 House Journal 16 P. 15 |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/15/2023); Senate Journal 20 |
2023-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2181e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/08/2023 House Journal 15 P. 76 |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2023-2181e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/08/2023); Senate Journal 19 |
2023-05-18 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2023-1338s (Rep. T. Walsh): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2023 House Journal 14 P. 3 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1338s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2023-1338s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1338s, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:10 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/16/2023 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 11 |
2023-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2023 House Journal 9 P. 22 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/07/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 8 |
2023-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing: 02/21/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Transportation |