NH HB137 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 08/31/2013; Chapter 0170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 08/31/2013; Chapter 0170
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special number plates for members of the national guard.
Title
Relative to special number plates for members of the national guard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor 07/02/2013; Effective 08/31/2013; Chapter 0170 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #0937s (Rep Bouchard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1565 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0937s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0937s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0937s, 5/30/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.305 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 6 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 11, PG.153 |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 1/22/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.183 |