NH HB1337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duration of unemployment benefits.
Title
Relative to the duration of unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - OTPA (Y: 179 N: 153 NV: 28 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/14/2022; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/14/2022; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0732h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-153 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0732h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0732h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |