NH HB1337 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 96
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public bodies under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to public bodies under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 96 |
2018-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0181h (NT) |
2018-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 43 |
2018-02-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-10 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 7 |