NH HB1332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to monetary judgments in class action civil suits under the Consumer Protection Act.
Title
Relative to monetary judgments in class action civil suits under the Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-01-31 | House | =CONTINUED= Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/30/2014 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302=RECESSED= |
2014-01-22 | House | =CONTINUED=Public Hearing: 1/30/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/14/2014 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302=RECESSED= |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs |