NH HB1329 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to creating special number plates for fire departments.
Title
Relative to creating special number plates for fire departments.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2024, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2024 House Journal 8 |
2024-03-08 | House | Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 7 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/13/2024 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 32 |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 |