NH HB1328 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-144 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-144 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limiting pregnancy terminations to pregnancies of 20 weeks or less.
Title
Limiting pregnancy terminations to pregnancies of 20 weeks or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - House - ITL (Y: 182 N: 144 NV: 47 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 182-144 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 153 |
2016-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0727h (NT) House Calendar 14 P. 58 |
2016-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 58 |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/18/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 10 |