NH HB1327 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the statute of limitations for continuing violations of trespass.
Title
Relative to the statute of limitations for continuing violations of trespass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 10 |
2016-02-17 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2016-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/02/2016 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/11/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 4 P. 10 |