NH HB132 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a tire disclosure for resales of trailers by utility dealers.
Title
Relative to a tire disclosure for resales of trailers by utility dealers.
Sponsors
Rep. Sue Newman [D] | Rep. Ray Newman [D] | Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] |
Rep. Linda Harriott-Gathright [D] | Rep. Linda Ryan [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB132 02/07/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Transportation |