NH HB132 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB132
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1
Summary
Relative to acreage required to build certain single family housing.
Title
Relative to acreage required to build certain single family housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-09-17 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 14 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 09/08/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94522837794 |
2021-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 14 |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 36 |
Same As/Similar To
HB132 (Carry Over) 2021-09-17 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=91&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB132 |