NH HB132 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Municipal and County Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to acreage required to build certain single family housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to acreage required to build certain single family housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseRetained in Committee
2021-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2021 01:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94522837794
2021-02-02HousePublic Hearing: 02/09/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93215390740 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 36

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback