NH HB1318 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 191; eff. 08/16/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 191; eff. 08/16/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to penalties for employer noncompliance with retirement system requirements.
Title
Relative to penalties for employer noncompliance with retirement system requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/07/2022; Chapter 191; eff. 08/16/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-07 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1214s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1214s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1214s, 03/31/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Hearing: 03/16/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/13/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 2:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-11-20 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |