NH HB1316 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 242; I. Sections 2 & 3 eff. 7/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 242; I. Sections 2 & 3 eff. 7/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to revenue collected from concealed carry licenses and relative to funding the permits and licensing unit of the state police.
Title
Relative to revenue collected from concealed carry licenses and relative to funding the permits and licensing unit of the state police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 242; I. Sections 2 & 3 eff. 7/1/2019; II. Rem. eff. 7/1/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1884s (Reps. Major, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1884s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Floor Amendment # 2018-1884s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/09/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Introduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 305-23 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 41 |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/21/2018 (Vote 24-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 19 |
2018-03-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-12 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division II Work Session: 03/14/2018 10:05 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-07 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-03-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-02-28 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 02/21/2018 03:15 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 02/20/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Finance 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 54 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 54 |
2018-02-08 | House | Special Order to next order of business (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 54 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/07/2018 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 27 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-10 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 6 |