NH HB1316 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929-930
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929-930
Summary
Requiring new construction and renovations of commercial buildings over 4,000 square feet to follow the Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) guidelines relative to volatile organic compounds.
Title
Requiring new construction and renovations of commercial buildings over 4,000 square feet to follow the Leadership in Energy and Environmental Design (LEED) guidelines relative to volatile organic compounds.
Sponsors
Rep. Catriona Beck [D] | Rep. Judith Day [D] | Rep. Paul Ingersoll [D] | Rep. Susan Kepner [D] |
Rep. Yvonne Thomas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.929-930 | |
2010-02-09 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (Vote 16-0); House Calendar 14, PG.580 | |
2010-01-27 | House Executive Session: 2/4/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-12 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/28/2010 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 6, PG.236 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2149&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |