NH HB1315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 25; Eff. 6/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 25; Eff. 6/24/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adding mixed-use development to the definition of business and industrial facility.
Title
Adding mixed-use development to the definition of business and industrial facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 25; Eff. 6/24/2016 |
2016-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 25 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/07/2016); Senate Journal 13 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/23/2016, Rooms 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Introduced 03/10/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 9 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 55 |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/09/2016 (Vote 12-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 34 |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2016 10:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 4 P. 10 |